CA SB144 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 305, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 305, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 7381 and 7382 of the Fish and Game Code, relating to fishing, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Fish and wildlife: steelhead trout: fishing report-restoration card.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike McGuire [D] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] | Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-05 - Assembly - SB 144 McGuire Third Reading Urgency By DAHLE (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # SB144 McGuire et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # SB144 McGuire et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 305, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2960.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-07-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 19). |
2017-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1354.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1178.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | April 3 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 363.) (March 14). |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Set for hearing March 14. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 16. |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 7381 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 7382 | Amended Code | Citation Text |