CA SB1437 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 311, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 311, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 5810 of, and to repeal Section 5811 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.
Title
Interior designers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1437 Roth Senate Third Reading By Berman (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1437 Roth (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1437 Roth (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 311, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Berman. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 3). |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3862.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3413.) (April 18). |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 5810 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 5811 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |