CA SB1436 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 624, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 624, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2860, 3710, 3716, 3758, 3758.6, and 3765 of, and to add Sections 2878.2 and 3760.5 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to respiratory therapy.
Title
Respiratory therapy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Senate - Special Consent SB1436 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-22 - Assembly - SB 1436 Roth Senate Third Reading By Berman (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1436 Roth (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-22 - Assembly - SB 1436 Roth Senate Third Reading By Berman (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1436 Roth (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 624, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5342.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6014.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2022-08-10 | Assembly | August 10 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-06-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3876.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3796.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3413.) (April 18). |
2022-04-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2860 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2878.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3710 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3716 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3758 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3758.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3760.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3765 | Amended Code | Citation Text |