CA SB1436 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 2 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 6453 of the Probate Code, relating to intestate succession.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural parent and child relationship: establishment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-02 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1436 Portantino Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - SB 1436 Portantino Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1436 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-10SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-07-02SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-06-19SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-06-18AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5860.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-06-13AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-06-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12).
2018-06-07AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-05-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-05-17AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-17SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5088.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-10SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-05-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4998.) (May 8).
2018-05-01SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2018-04-30SenateMay 1 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-04-30SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-04-24SenateSet for hearing May 1.
2018-04-23SenateMay 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-18SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2018-04-04SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-03-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Probate Code6453Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback