CA SB1435 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-09 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-09 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65940 of, to amend and renumber Section 12097.5 of, to add Section 12097.5 to, and to add and repeal Sections 12097.7 and 12097.8 of, the Government Code, relating to opportunity zones.
Title
Opportunity zone funds: reporting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12097.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 12097.7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12097.8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65940 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1435 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1435 |