CA SB1434 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 259, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 711.1 and 3702.1 to the Fish and Game Code, relating to fish and wildlife.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Funding of fish and wildlife programs: State Duck Stamp

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-08-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1434 Wolk Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-07 - Assembly - SB 1434 Wolk Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1434 Wolk (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-08-22 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 259, Statutes of 2014.
2014-08-22 Approved by the Governor.
2014-08-13SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2014-08-11SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4404.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2014-08-07SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2014-08-07AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5917.) Ordered to the Senate.
2014-07-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2014-07-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2).
2014-06-17AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-06-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
2014-06-09AssemblyReferred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
2014-05-19AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2014-05-19SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3493.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2014-05-13SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-05-12SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2014-05-02SenateSet for hearing May 12.
2014-04-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3297.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-04-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. Set for hearing April 29.
2014-04-21SenateSet, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2014-03-27SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2014-03-17SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2014-02-24SenateRead first time.
2014-02-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
2014-02-21SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Fish and Game Code3702.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Fish and Game Code711.1New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_1434&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1401-1450/sb_1434_bill_20140221_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1401-1450/sb_1434_bill_20140421_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1401-1450/sb_1434_bill_20140422_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1401-1450/sb_1434_bill_20140611_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1401-1450/sb_1434_bill_20140812_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1401-1450/sb_1434_bill_20140822_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1401-1450/sb_1434_vote_20140429_000004_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1401-1450/sb_1434_vote_20140519_0116PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1401-1450/sb_1434_vote_20140617_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1401-1450/sb_1434_vote_20140702_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1401-1450/sb_1434_vote_20140807_1022AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1401-1450/sb_1434_vote_20140811_0222PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback