CA SB1434 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 3.6 (commencing with Section 1546) to Title 12 of Part 2 of the Penal Code, relating to location information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Location information: warrants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-08-23 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1434 Leno Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-22 - Assembly - SB 1434 Leno Senate Third Reading By HAGMAN (Y: 63 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1434 Leno (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-30 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2012-09-30 Vetoed by the Governor.
2012-08-30 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2012-08-23 Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 3. Page 4771.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2012-08-22 In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2012-08-22 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 11. Page 6146.) Ordered to the Senate.
2012-08-08 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-08-07 Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2012-08-06 From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 3).
2012-06-28 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2012-06-26 Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2012-06-19 Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2012-06-07 Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2012-05-30 In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2012-05-30 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 3699.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2012-05-25 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-05-24 Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2012-05-01 Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2012-04-30 From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3313.) (April 24).
2012-04-11 Set for hearing April 24.
2012-04-09 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2012-03-22 Referred to Com. on RLS.
2012-02-27 Read first time.
2012-02-26 From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2012-02-24 Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code1546New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code496Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_1434&sess=1112&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1401-1450/sb_1434_bill_20120224_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1401-1450/sb_1434_bill_20120409_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1401-1450/sb_1434_bill_20120501_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1401-1450/sb_1434_bill_20120524_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1401-1450/sb_1434_bill_20120628_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1401-1450/sb_1434_bill_20120807_amended_asm_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1401-1450/sb_1434_bill_20120827_enrolled.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1401-1450/sb_1434_vote_20120424_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1401-1450/sb_1434_vote_20120530_1205PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1401-1450/sb_1434_vote_20120703_000003_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1401-1450/sb_1434_vote_20120822_0250PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1401-1450/sb_1434_vote_20120823_0359PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback