CA SB1434 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-23 - In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 2153 and 2154 of the Elections Code, relating to voter registration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter registration: incomplete affidavits: rebuttable

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-08-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1434 Price (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-01 - Assembly - SB 1434 Price Senate Third Reading By ADAMS (Y: 47 N: 27 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1434 Price (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-08-23 In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
2010-08-23 Vetoed by Governor.
2010-08-11 Enrolled. To Governor at 3 p.m.
2010-08-09 Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 4404.) To enrollment.
2010-07-01 In Senate. To unfinished business.
2010-07-01 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 47. Noes 27. Page 5932.) To Senate.
2010-06-28 Read second time. To third reading.
2010-06-24 Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
2010-06-23 From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on June 22.)
2010-06-10 To Com. on E. & R.
2010-05-27 In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2010-05-27 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 11. Page 3622.) To Assembly.
2010-04-22 Read second time. To third reading.
2010-04-21 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 3297.)
2010-04-08 Set for hearing April 20.
2010-03-11 To Com. on E., R., & C.A.
2010-02-20 From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2010-02-19 Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_1434&sess=0910&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_1401-1450/sb_1434_bill_20100219_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_1401-1450/sb_1434_bill_20100624_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_1401-1450/sb_1434_bill_20100810_enrolled.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_1401-1450/sb_1434_vote_20100420_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_1401-1450/sb_1434_vote_20100527_0942AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_1401-1450/sb_1434_vote_20100622_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_1401-1450/sb_1434_vote_20100701_1150AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_1401-1450/sb_1434_vote_20100809_0529PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback