CA SB1428 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 622, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 622, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2987 of, and to add Article 10 (commencing with Section 2999.100) to Chapter 6.6 of Division 2 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Psychological testing technicians.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1428 Archuleta Senate Third Reading By Salas (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1428 Archuleta et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1428 Archuleta et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 622, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-21 | Assembly | June 21 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3980.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3308.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2987 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2999.100 | New Code | See Bill Text |