CA SB1428 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 420, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 49120 to the Education Code, relating to minor work permits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minors: employment: work permits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-20 - Assembly - SB 1428 McGuire Senate Third Reading By O'DONNELL (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Employment] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1428 McGuire (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-14 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 420, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-14 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-28SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-08-21SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 6404.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-06-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20).
2018-06-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
2018-05-07AssemblyReferred to Coms. on ED. and L. & E.
2018-04-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-04-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4879.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-04-25SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4717.) (April 18).
2018-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2018-04-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4626.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 11.
2018-04-04SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2018-03-20SenateApril 11 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-03-16SenateSet for hearing April 11.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and ED.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code49101Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code49120New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code49140Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code49142New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code49160Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code49181Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code1304Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback