CA SB1425 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 997, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 997, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 65565.5 to the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Open-space element: updates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-22 - Assembly - SB 1425 Stern Senate Third Reading By Luz Rivas (Y: 58 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1425 Stern et al (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1425 Stern et al (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 997, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-23 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 14. Page 5996.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (June 29). |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 3824.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3377.) (April 7). |
2022-03-31 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Set for hearing April 7. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65565.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |