CA SB1425 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 596, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 596, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 6 (commencing with Section 71420) to Division 34 of the Public Resources Code, relating to greenhouse gases.
Title
Water-energy nexus registry.
Sponsors
Sen. Fran Pavley [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1425 Pavley Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Assembly - SB 1425 Pavley Senate Third Reading By WILLIAMS (Y: 53 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1425 Pavley Senate Third Reading By A.,E.,S.,T.,& I.M. Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1425 Pavley (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Assembly - SB 1425 Pavley Senate Third Reading By WILLIAMS (Y: 53 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1425 Pavley Senate Third Reading By A.,E.,S.,T.,& I.M. Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1425 Pavley (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 596, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2016-08-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 5491.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 6239.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5972.) Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 11). |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 4058.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 4010.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-05-02 | Senate | May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3419.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 39732 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44272 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 71420 | New Code | See Bill Text |