CA SB1422 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 902, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 116376 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to drinking water.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Safe Drinking Water Act: microplastics.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1422 Portantino Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1422 Portantino Senate Third Reading By QUIRK (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent SB1422 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 902, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-28 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-12SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 6137.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-30SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 6966.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-23AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-23AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-16AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended.
2018-08-15AssemblyAugust 15 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-08-09AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-19AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4457.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4310.) (May 25).
2018-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-22SenateMay 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-05-10SenateMay 14 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-04-26SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4720.) (April 18).
2018-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2018-04-04SenateRe-referred to Com. on EQ.
2018-04-02SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code116376New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback