CA SB142 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1203 and 1203.1 of, and to add and repeal Chapter 3.5 (commencing with Section 1233.51) of Title 8 of Part 2 of, the Penal Code, relating to criminal offenders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal offenders: mental health.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB142 Beall (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16AssemblyAugust 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-08-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-21AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-06-27AssemblyJune 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-21AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-06-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 4. Page 1338.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenatePublished May 26 at 2 p.m.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1178.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-03SenateMay 8 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-01SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2017-04-24SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 747.) (April 18).
2017-04-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-03-23SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2017-03-16SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-03-08SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-01-26SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-01-17SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 16.
2017-01-13SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code1203Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1203.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1233.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code1233.51New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback