CA SB1419 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 888, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 888, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 123115 and 123148 of, and to add Section 1374.196 to, the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10133.12 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care.
Title
Health information.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Becker [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1419 Becker Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1419 Becker Senate Third Reading By Arambula (Y: 53 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1419 Becker (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1419 Becker Senate Third Reading By Arambula (Y: 53 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1419 Becker (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 888, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 5317.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 11). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (June 14). |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 3875.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3796.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 3438.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 3349.) (April 6). |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19 in JUD. pending receipt. |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 123115 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 123148 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1374.196 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10133.12 | New Code | See Bill Text |