CA SB1419 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 7150.16 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to anatomical gifts.
Title
Uniform Anatomical Gift Act: prison inmates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-23 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee without further action. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | May 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | May 23 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | May 16 hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3615.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3446.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 7150.16 | New Code | See Bill Text |