CA SB1418 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 14102.1 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medi-Cal: immigration status.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-11-30SenateFrom committee without further action.
2016-05-04SenateRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2016-05-02SenateWithdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2016-04-26SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2016-04-19SenateApril 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2016-04-13SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2016-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2016-03-31SenateRe-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2016-03-28SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2016-03-10SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2016-02-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time.
2016-02-19SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code1246.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1288Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14102.1New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback