CA SB1412 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-03 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 432.7 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Applicants for employment: criminal history.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1412 Bradford (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-03AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-19AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 4465.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateRead third time and amended.
2018-05-08SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-07SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-04-27SenateSet for hearing May 7.
2018-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4820.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2018-04-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 4626.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-03-16SenateSet for hearing April 11.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and PUB. S.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code432.7Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback