CA SB141 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 22949.80 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 68085.1 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Sections 13956, 13957, 13957.5, 13959, and 13962 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 290.008, 457.1, 1203.4b, and 1463.001 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 4900 and 4904 of, and to add Section 679.027 to, the Penal Code, and to amend Section 1732.10 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public safety, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Public safety trailer bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB141 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes. |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. |
2022-08-26 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-06-28 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | (Corrected May 14). |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 282.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 5. Page 201.) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 22949.80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 13956 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 13957 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 13957.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 13959 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 13962 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 68085.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1203.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1463.001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 290.008 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 457.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 4900 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 4904 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 1732.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |