CA SB1409 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - April 27 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 3. Page 3545.)
Pending: Senate Labor, Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - April 27 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 3. Page 3545.)
Pending: Senate Labor, Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 9 (commencing with Section 1167) to Part 3.5 of, and to repeal Part 3.5 of, Division 2 of the Labor Code, relating to labor relations.
Title
Agricultural Labor Relations Board: abolishment of the board: appropriation of funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Senate | April 27 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 3. Page 3545.) |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 1167 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |