CA SB1406 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on September 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 612, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 78041, 78042, and 78043 of the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public postsecondary education: community college districts: baccalaureate degree pilot program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-28 - Assembly - SB 1406 Hill Senate Third Reading By MEDINA (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1406 Hill et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-20 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 612, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-20 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-10SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-30SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6061.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-29SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-08-28SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6720.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-08-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2018-04-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-04-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4877.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-04-26SenateOrdered to third reading.
2018-04-26SenateFrom consent calendar on motion of Senator Hill.
2018-04-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-04-23SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2018-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2018-04-10SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4534.) (April 4).
2018-03-13SenateSet for hearing April 4.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code78041Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code78042Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code78043Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback