CA SB1401 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - June 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 71360 of the Public Resources Code, relating to climate change.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Climate change: climate adaptation information: clearinghouse.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-11AssemblyJune 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-05-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-05-10AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-10SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5014.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-08SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-05-07SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2018-04-27SenateSet for hearing May 7.
2018-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4788.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2018-04-04SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2018-03-20SenateSet for hearing April 4.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Coms. on EQ. and N.R. & W.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code71360Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback