CA SB1401 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - June 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - June 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 71360 of the Public Resources Code, relating to climate change.
Title
Climate change: climate adaptation information: clearinghouse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1401 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | Assembly | June 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5014.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 7. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4788.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on EQ. and N.R. & W. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 71360 | Amended Code | Citation Text |