CA SB140 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 33432 of the Education Code, relating to education finance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education finance: Learning Communities for School Success Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB140 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-01AssemblySeptember 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2017-07-19AssemblyJuly 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-06-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2017-05-16AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-15SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1073.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-05-08SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-03SenateMay 8 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-01SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2017-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 847.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 26.
2017-03-29SenateRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-03-22SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-03-22SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-03-21SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-01-26SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-01-17SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 16.
2017-01-13SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback