CA SB14 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 672, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 672, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 48205 of, and to add Section 49428.15 to, the Education Code, relating to pupil health, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Pupil health: school employee and pupil training: excused absences: youth mental and behavioral health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-10 - Assembly - SB 14 Portantino Third Reading Urgency By Low (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB14 Portantino et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB14 Portantino et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB14 Portantino et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB14 Portantino et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 672, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2635.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 3136.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2021-08-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 19). |
2021-07-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 7). |
2021-06-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1415.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1178.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | April 5 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 666.) (March 10). |
2021-03-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Set for hearing March 10. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-12-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7. |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 48205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 49428.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |