CA SB1399 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 155, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 155, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4853 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Department of Motor Vehicles: license plate alternatives pilot program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-04 - Assembly - SB 1399 Hueso Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1399 Hueso (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1399 Hueso (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 155, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-08-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2016-08-04 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5721.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3776.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-05-02 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3617.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 5386.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 4853 | Amended Code | Citation Text |