CA SB1398 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 308, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 308, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 24011.5 to the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: consumer notices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1398 Gonzalez Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1398 Gonzalez Senate Third Reading By Cunningham (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1398 Gonzalez (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1398 Gonzalez Senate Third Reading By Cunningham (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1398 Gonzalez (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 308, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5306.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 28). |
2022-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and JUD. |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 3830.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | From consent calendar on motion of Senator Wilk. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3515.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 3441.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26 in JUD. pending receipt. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on TRANS. and JUD. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 24011.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |