CA SB1397 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 16).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 19300 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to automated external defibrillators.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Automated external defibrillators: requirement: modifications to existing buildings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent SB1397 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4457.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4309.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-07SenateMay 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-01SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-01SenateSet for hearing May 7.
2018-04-30SenateApril 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-20SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2018-04-17SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 4606.) (April 10).
2018-04-02SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-03-29SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code19300Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code19301New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback