CA SB1394 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and JUD.
Pending: Assembly Elections and Redistricting Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 102.5 to the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Petitions: compensation for signatures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1394 Newman (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on E. & R. and JUD.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 4460.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4309.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-14SenateMay 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-04-30SenateApril 30 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-04-20SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2018-04-18SenateRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-18SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-04-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4723.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-04-09SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2018-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4514.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-03-12SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Coms. on E. & C.A., JUD., and PUB. S.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code102.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback