CA SB1392 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 18. Noes 16. Page 4462.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 18. Noes 16. Page 4462.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 667.5 of the Penal Code, relating to sentencing.
Title
Sentencing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1392 Mitchell et al (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1392 Mitchell et al. Reconsider (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1392 Mitchell et al (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations="No Votes Recorded">No Votes Recorded: (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1392 Mitchell et al. Reconsider (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1392 Mitchell et al (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations="No Votes Recorded">No Votes Recorded: (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 18. Noes 16. Page 4462.) |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4361.) |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Motion to reconsider made by Senator Mitchell. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 17. Noes 14. Page 4361.) |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4516.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 667.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |