CA SB1391 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1012, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 707 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juveniles: fitness for juvenile court.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1391 Lara et al. Concurrence (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1391 Lara Senate Third Reading By CHIU (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1391 Lara et al (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1012, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-07SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-30SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 6034.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-29SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 41. Noes 23. Page 6924.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-21AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 4391.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4309.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-04-23SenateApril 23 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2018-04-11SenateApril 16 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2018-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4516.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-14SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code707Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback