CA SB1388 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 714, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 714, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 266k and 647 of the Penal Code, relating to human trafficking.
Title
Human trafficking.
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Lieu [D] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Sen. Holly Mitchell [D] | Sen. Robert Huff [R] |
Asm. Ken Cooley [D] | Sen. Susan Eggman [D] | Asm. Kristin Olsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-21 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1388 Lieu (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1388 Lieu Senate Third Reading By COOLEY (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1388 Lieu (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1388 Lieu Senate Third Reading By COOLEY (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1388 Lieu (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 714, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4684.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6121.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3592.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. |
2014-05-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 5. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3218.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 266 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 647 | Amended Code | Citation Text |