CA SB1386 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 334, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 3070 and 3077 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Optometry.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1386 McGuire Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1386 McGuire Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1386 McGuire (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-10 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 334, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-10 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-30SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-24SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5693.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-23SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6517.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-16AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-08-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 15).
2018-06-21AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 19).
2018-06-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-06-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 5. Page 4349.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-23SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4240.) (May 22).
2018-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4783.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-19SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-04-12SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2018-04-04SenateRe-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-03-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback