CA SB1386 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 334, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 334, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3070 and 3077 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.
Title
Optometry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1386 McGuire Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1386 McGuire Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1386 McGuire (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1386 McGuire Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1386 McGuire (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 334, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5693.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-23 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6517.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 15). |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 5. Page 4349.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4240.) (May 22). |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4783.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 126 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 16780 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3041.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3059 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3070 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3077 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |