CA SB1385 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-28 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Jun 8 @ 9:00 am in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 53339.6 and 65913.4 of, and to add Section 65852.23 to, the Government Code, relating to land use.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local planning: housing: commercial zones.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-21SenateSet for hearing May 28.
2020-05-20SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2020-05-11SenateRe-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2020-05-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2020-03-12SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2020-02-24SenateRead first time.
2020-02-24SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
2020-02-21SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code53339.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code65852.23New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code65913.4Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback