CA SB1385 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8483.55 of, and to add and repeal Section 44394 of, the Education Code, relating to after school programs.
Title
After school programs: California After School Teacher
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1385 Hancock (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1385 Hancock (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-16 | Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |
2012-08-08 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-06-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-19 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-06-07 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-05-30 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-29 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3644.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-25 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-24 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3595.) (May 24). | |
2012-05-18 | Set for hearing May 24. | |
2012-04-30 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-04-20 | Set for hearing April 30. | |
2012-04-10 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-09 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3034.) (March 28). | |
2012-03-16 | Set for hearing March 28. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-25 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 44394 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8483.55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8483.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |