CA SB1383 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 86, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend and repeal Section 12945.6 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Section 12945.2 of, the Government Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unlawful employment practice: California Family Rights Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Assembly - SB 1383 Jackson Senate Third Reading By Gonzalez (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1383 Jackson et al (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-17 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 86, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-17 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-08SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2020-08-31SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2020-08-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 46. Noes 16.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-08-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (August 20).
2020-08-18AssemblyAugust 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2020-07-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-30AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2020-07-27AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2020-07-27AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended.
2020-07-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-07-02SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 12. Page 3930.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-06-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-29SenateOrdered to second reading.
2020-06-29SenateRead third time and amended.
2020-06-25SenateJoint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 3861.)
2020-06-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 8. Page 3829.) (June 24).
2020-06-24SenateRe-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2020-06-24Senate(Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 3815.)
2020-06-24SenateJoint Rules 61 and 62 suspended.
2020-06-24SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
2020-06-24Senate(Corrected June 24).
2020-06-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-23SenateOrdered to second reading.
2020-06-23SenateRead third time and amended.
2020-06-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-18SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-06-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3771.) (June 18).
2020-06-11SenateSet for hearing June 18.
2020-06-09SenateJune 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2020-06-03SenateSet for hearing June 9.
2020-06-02SenateHearing rescheduled due to Capitol closure.
2020-05-26SenateSet for hearing June 1.
2020-05-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (May 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-11SenateRe-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2020-05-08SenateSet for hearing May 14 in L., P.E. & R. pending receipt.
2020-03-25SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2020-03-12SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2020-02-24SenateRead first time.
2020-02-24SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
2020-02-21SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12945.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code12945.6Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback