CA SB1382 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - May 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 6126.4, 6401, 22440, 22441, 22441.1, 22442, 22442.1, 22442.2, 22442.3, 22442.4, 22442.5, 22442.6, 22443, 22443.1, 22443.3, 22444, 22446.5, 22447, and 22449 of, and to amend the heading of Chapter 19.5 (commencing with Section 22440) of Division 8 of, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 8223 of the Government Code, relating to immigration form assistants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Immigration form assistants.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21SenateMay 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2020-05-15SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2020-03-12SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2020-02-24SenateRead first time.
2020-02-24SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
2020-02-21SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code22440Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code22441Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code22441.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code22442Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code22442.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code22442.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code22442.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code22442.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code22442.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code22442.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code22443Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code22443.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code22443.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code22444Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code22446.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code22447Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code22449Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code6126.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code6401Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code8223Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback