CA SB1380 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 847, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 847, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 6.5 (commencing with Section 8255) to Division 8 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to homelessness.
Title
Homeless Coordinating and Financing Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1380 Mitchell Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1380 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By CHIU (Y: 55 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1380 Mitchell (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1380 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By CHIU (Y: 55 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1380 Mitchell (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 847, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-09 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2016-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 5555.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 24. Page 6369.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (August 11). |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 29). |
2016-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 4055.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4009.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 3617.) (April 19). |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19 in T. & H. pending receipt. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 3519.) (April 12). |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 8255 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 8260 | New Code | See Bill Text |