CA SB1374 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-25 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-25 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Section 19132.5 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Personal income taxes: timeliness penalty: abatement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19132.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1374 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1374 |