CA SB1370 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
Pending: Assembly Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 2104.7 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to natural gas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Aliso Canyon natural gas storage facility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1370 Stern (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on U. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2018-08-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-24AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-16AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 15).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-07-02Assembly(Received June 29 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(b)(13)).
2018-07-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-02AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-06-18AssemblyJune 18 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 4332.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-01SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-30SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-04-20SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2018-04-17SenateRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-17SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-04-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 4699.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2018-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 18 in EQ. pending receipt.
2018-03-14SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and EQ.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code3160Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code2104.7Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback