CA SB1365 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
Pending: Assembly Water, Parks and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 2941 of, and to add Sections 2941.5, 2944, and 2946 to, the Fish and Game Code, relating to the Salton Sea.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Salton Sea: Office of Salton Sea Restoration: design-build contract: reorganization.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1365 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2018-08-16AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-13AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-13AssemblyFrom consent calendar.
2018-08-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-08-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
2018-07-05AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 25).
2018-06-25AssemblyJune 25 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-06-25AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 21. Page 5955.)
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4359.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-05-22SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2018-05-15SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-05-14SenateMay 14 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-04-30SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4788.) (April 24).
2018-04-02SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2018-03-29SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Fish and Game Code2941Amended CodeCitation Text
Fish and Game Code2941.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Fish and Game Code2944New CodeSee Bill Text
Fish and Game Code2946New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code31121New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback