CA SB1363 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-06 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-06 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 51210 and 51220 of the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.
Title
Adopted course of study: Asian Americans and Pacific Islanders.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] | Asm. Steven Choi [R] | Asm. Jim Cooper [D] | Asm. Phillip Chen [R] |
Asm. Ken Cooley [D] | Sen. Dave Cortese [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. Vince Fong [R] |
Asm. Adam Gray [D] | Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] | Sen. Janet Nguyen [R] | Sen. Susan Rubio [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1363 Nielsen (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 0. Page 3701.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3348.) (April 6). |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 51210 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 51220 | Amended Code | Citation Text |