CA SB1362 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 22295 of, and to add Sections 830.75, 26065, and 32455 to, the Penal Code, relating to security officers.
Title
Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee without further action. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | April 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | April 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and PUB. S. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 7582.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 22295 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26065 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 32455 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 830.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 830.75 | New Code | See Bill Text |