CA SB1361 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 28 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-09-10 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 329, 331, and 583 of, and to add Section 331.5 to, the Financial Code, relating to the Department of Business Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Business Oversight: administration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1361 Bradford Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 1361 Bradford Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1361 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-10SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-28SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5835.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-21SenateFrom committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 5578.)
2018-08-21SenateSet for hearing August 21.
2018-08-20SenateFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5450.) Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
2018-08-20SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
2018-08-16SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6312.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-08-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
2018-07-02AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
2018-06-06AssemblyJune 11 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-05-10AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & F.
2018-05-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-03SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4942.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-01SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-04-30SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2018-04-20SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2018-04-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4745.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2018-04-05SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
2018-04-04SenateRe-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
2018-03-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Financial Code1078Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code329Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code331Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code331.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code583Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code7102Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback