CA SB136 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 9.1 (commencing with Section 12100.96) of Chapter 1.6 of Part 2 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 248.6 and 248.7 of the Labor Code, and to amend Sections 17158 and 24312 of, and to add and repeal Article 8.1 (commencing with Section 19295.1) of Chapter 5 of Part 10.2 of Division 2 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to COVID-19 relief, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
COVID-19 relief: supplemental paid sick leave.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB136 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes. |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. |
2022-08-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-06-28 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | (Corrected May 14). |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 280.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 5. Page 201.) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12100.96 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 248.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 248.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17158 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19295.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 24312 | Amended Code | Citation Text |