CA SB1358 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 69433.5 and 69433.6 of the Education Code, relating to student financial aid.
Title
Student financial aid: Cal Grant Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Marty Block [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee without further action. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | April 13 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Set for hearing April 13. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 69433.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 69433.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |