CA SB1356 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - April 26 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 5. Page 3522.)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - April 26 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 5. Page 3522.)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 35556 to the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Gross vehicle weight.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Senate | April 26 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 5. Page 3522.) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | April 19 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 35556 | New Code | See Bill Text |