CA SB1356 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 5 (commencing with Section 78280) to Chapter 2 of Part 48 of Division 7 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to the California Community Colleges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Community Colleges: Antelope Valley College: Aerospace Institute.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1356 Wilk et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16AssemblyAugust 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-20AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4314.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4309.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-04-30SenateApril 30 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-20SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2018-04-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4717.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-10SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2018-04-09SenateApril 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 11.
2018-04-04SenateRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-04-02SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code78280New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback