CA SB1354 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - June 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 79148.1 to the Education Code, relating to community colleges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community colleges: California Apprenticeship Initiative (CAI) New and Innovative Grant Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-23 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1354 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-19AssemblyJune 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2018-04-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-04-23SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4764.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-04-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-04-16SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2018-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2018-04-04SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4533.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-13SenateSet for hearing April 4.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code79148.1New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback